US HB1821 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-10 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-10 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Equity for Injured Veterans Act of 2009 - Extends the period of eligibility for training and rehabilitation through the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for veterans with service-connected disabilities until the end of the 15 (under current law, 12) year period after the veteran's discharge from active-duty service. Allows a service-disabled veteran a subsistence allowance for six (under current law, two) months of full-time employment training following completion of a vocational rehabilitation program. Allows such a veteran who has unused VA educational assistance entitlement to use such assistance to pursue a program of education as part of a vocational rehabilitation program, as long as the Secretary of Veterans Affairs approves the educational, professional, or vocational objective chosen by the veteran. Directs the Secretary to provide reimbursement for child care to a veteran who is participating in a vocational rehabilitation program and is the sole caretaker of a child. Requires the Secretary to include in annual budget materials submitted to Congress information on veterans receiving vocational rehabilitation assistance who: (1) became employed; and (2) achieved independence in daily living.
Title
Equity for Injured Veterans Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Kendrick Meek [D-FL] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Bart Stupak [D-MI] | Rep. Harry Teague [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-10 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2009-06-10 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-06-04 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . | |
2009-06-04 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-05-22 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-05-21 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-04-03 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Child care and development
Disability assistance
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Child care and development
Disability assistance
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1821/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1821/BILLS-111hr1821ih.pdf |