US HB182 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the Cape Cod National Seashore Advisory Commission through September 25, 2028.
Title
To extend the authorization for the Cape Cod National Seashore Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2019-11-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9072) |
2019-11-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 182. |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9072-9074) |
2019-11-20 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-11-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 217. |
2019-11-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-272. |
2019-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB508 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.