US HB1807 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Educating Entrepreneurs through Today's Technology Act - Amends the Small Business Act to direct the Administrator of the Small Business Administration (SBA) to contract with qualified vendors for entrepreneurial training content, the development of communications technology that can distribute such content throughout the United States, and the establishment of a nationwide, online network for the exchange of peer-to-peer technical assistance. Directs the Administrator to ensure that the content developed is: (1) timely and relevant to entrepreneurial development and can be successfully communicated remotely to an audience through the use of technology; and (2) able to be distributed to small businesses, home-based businesses, small business development centers, women's business centers, veterans business centers, the SBA, and network entrepreneurs throughout the United States and its territories. Requires a report from the Administrator to Congress on SBA progress in implementing this Act. Authorizes appropriations.
Title
Educating Entrepreneurs through Today's Technology Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-29 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. | |
2009-07-28 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-28 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8915-8916) | |
2009-07-28 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1807. | |
2009-07-28 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8915-8916) | |
2009-07-28 | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-05-13 | Provisions of measure incorporated into H.R. 2352. | |
2009-04-30 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . | |
2009-04-30 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Rural Development, Entrepreneurship and Trade. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2352 (Related) 2009-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Subjects
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Educational technology and distance education
Financial literacy
Higher education
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Commerce
Educational technology and distance education
Financial literacy
Higher education
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business