US HB1776 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-3)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Captive Primate Safety Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Captive Primate Safety Act

Sponsors

Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2562 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback