US HB1767 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide that educational assistance paid under Department of Veterans Affairs educational assistance programs to an individual who pursued a program or course of education that was suspended or terminated for certain reasons shall not be charged against the entitlement of the individual, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide that educational assistance paid under Department of Veterans Affairs educational assistance programs to an individual who pursued a program or course of education that was suspended or terminated for certain reasons shall not be charged against the entitlement of the individual, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Delia Ramirez [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Greg Casar [D-TX] |
Rep. Morgan McGarvey [D-KY] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] |
Rep. Maxwell Frost [D-FL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Deluzio [D-PA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Nikki Budzinski [D-IL] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 161 (Y: 406 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-04-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 6 (Roll no. 161). |
2024-04-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-04-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-04-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1767. |
2024-04-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-04-29 | House | Mr. Bost moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-18 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2023-04-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2023-03-24 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1428) |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |