US HB175 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ENERGY STAR Regulatory Improvement Act This bill amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to require the Environmental Protection Agency to revise the Energy Star program to exempt program partners that have complied with all program requirements for a period of at least 18 months from third-party certification requirements for the labeling of consumer, home, and office electronic products. In order to facilitate product listing and performance verification for a sample of products, the EPA may require test data and other product information to be submitted. The exemption from third-party certification provided to a program partner will be terminated if the partner is found to have violated program requirements with respect to at least two separate models during a two-year period. The exemption will resume if the partner complies with all program requirements for at least three years.
Title
ENERGY STAR Regulatory Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB720 (Related) 2015-09-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 210.
HB2177 (Related) 2015-08-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
HB2177 (Related) 2015-08-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer affairs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental technology
Licensing and registrations
Product safety and quality
Consumer affairs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental technology
Licensing and registrations
Product safety and quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/175/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr175/BILLS-114hr175ih.pdf |