US HB1740 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Faith-Based Community Center Protection Act This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to: (1) permit the use of Urban Area Security Initiative or State Homeland Security Grant Program grant funds to protect a faith-based community center or vulnerable populations, including children or the elderly; and (2) define "faith-based community center" as a facility operated by a nonprofit faith-based community organization for the provision of recreational, social, or education services to the general public. The bill amends the federal criminal code to increase the term of imprisonment from 5 to 10 years for engaging in conduct with intent to convey false or misleading information that indicates that an activity has taken, is taking, or will take place that would constitute a violation of specified prohibitions, including certain prohibtions under the Atomic Energy Act of 1954.
Title
Faith-Based Community Center Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] |
Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB461 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Community life and organization
Emergency management
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Homeland security
Religion
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Community life and organization
Emergency management
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Homeland security
Religion
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Urban and suburban affairs and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1740/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1740/BILLS-115hr1740ih.pdf |