US HB174 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sarah's Law This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to require the detention of an alien: (1) who was not inspected and admitted into the United States, who held a revoked nonimmigrant visa (or other nonimmigrant admission document), or who is deportable for failing to maintain nonimmigrant status; and (2) who has been charged in the United States with a crime that resulted in the death or serious bodily injury of another person. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement shall make reasonable efforts to: obtain information about the identity of any victims of the crimes for which such alien was charged or convicted; and provide the victim, or a parent, guardian, spouse, or closest living relative of a deceased victim, with information about such alien, including name, date of birth, nationality, immigration status, criminal history, and a description of any related removal efforts.
Title
Sarah's Law
Sponsors
Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] |
Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB300 (Same As) 2017-01-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB37 (Same As) 2017-01-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB37 (Same As) 2017-01-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Crime victims
Criminal justice information and records
Detention of persons
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Visas and passports
Crime victims
Criminal justice information and records
Detention of persons
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/174/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr174/BILLS-115hr174ih.pdf |