US HB1727 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-163.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-163.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Chesapeake and Ohio Canal Development Act to extend the Chesapeake and Ohio Canal National Historical Park Commission.
Title
Chesapeake and Ohio Canal National Historical Park Commission Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 36 (Y: 427 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 118-163. |
2024-12-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2024-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2024-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7078) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 333. |
2024-02-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-02-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 427 - 2 (Roll no. 36). |
2024-02-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-02-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Westerman objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2024-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1727. |
2024-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H396-397; text: CR H396) |
2024-02-05 | House | Mr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-01-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 297. |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-363. |
2023-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-15 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2023-10-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-04-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB924 (Same As) 2023-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 295.