US HB1725 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-130. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-130. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Quicker Veterans Benefits Delivery Act of 2017 (Sec. 1) This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), within 180 days of enactment of this bill, to submit a report on the progress of the VA's Acceptable Clinical Evidence initiative in reducing the necessity for in-person disability examinations. Such report shall include: (1) the number of claims eligible for the initiative, disaggregated by fiscal year; (2) the total number of claims eligible for the initiative that required a VA medical examiner to supplement the evidence with information obtained during a telephone interview with the claimant; (3) information on other VA initiatives to encourage the use of private medical evidence; (4) the anticipated impact on the time line and accuracy of processing claims if the VA were prohibited from requesting a private medical examination that is adequate for a claims decision; and (5) recommendations on how the VA can measure, track, and prevent the ordering of unnecessary medical examinations when a private examination has been administered. (Sec. 2) The VA shall submit by March 1 of FY2018-FY2024 an annual report that includes for each VA regional office: (1) the number of times a veteran who submitted private medical evidence in support of a claim for compensation or pension was scheduled for an examination by VA personnel because the private medical evidence was determined to be unacceptable, (2) the most common reasons for such determinations, and (3) the types of disabilities for which claims were most commonly denied when private medical evidence was submitted.
Title
Quicker Veterans Benefits Delivery Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] |
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-130. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1190-1191) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-05-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4475) |
2017-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1725. |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4475-4476) |
2017-05-23 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 82. |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-133. |
2017-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2017-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-03-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB706 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation