US HB1704 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Championing American Business Through Diplomacy Act of 2019 This bill establishes within the Department of State an Assistant Secretary of State for Economic and Business Matters, and establishes that a principal duty of a diplomatic mission to a foreign country is the promotion of U.S. economic and commercial interests in that country. The Assistant Secretary shall be responsible for matters relating to international economics and business matters in foreign policy. The State Department shall train various Foreign Service officers, as part of their standard training, on matters including economic and commercial diplomacy, with a particular focus on market access, commercial advocacy, and increasing awareness of U.S. government assistance available to businesses. The President shall initiate negotiations with countries to establish international standards for government-supported infrastructure investment overseas. The negotiations shall cover issues including the sovereignty of countries receiving investment, anti-corruption, and environmental standards. The bill calls for various reports to Congress, including a State Department report about each mission's activities to promote U.S. economic and business interests, and a State Department and Department of Commerce report on commercial relations with foreign countries, including information on each country or region's political environment and investment climate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Championing American Business Through Diplomacy Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 186 (Y: 400 N: 16 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-05-07HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-07HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 16 (Roll no. 186). (text: CR H3459-3460)
2019-05-07HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3461-3462)
2019-05-07HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-05-07HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1704.
2019-05-07HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3459-3461)
2019-05-07HouseMr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-04-09HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback