US HB1695 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-11)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Register of Copyrights Selection and Accountability Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends federal copyright law to require the President, with the advice and consent of the Senate, to appoint a Register of Copyrights from a list of at least three individuals recommended by a panel composed of: the Speaker of the House of Representatives; the President pro tempore of the Senate; the majority and minority leaders of the House and the Senate; and the Librarian of Congress. (Currently, the Register of Copyrights is appointed by the Librarian of Congress.) To be eligible for appointment, the individual must be a citizen of the United States with a professional background and experience in copyright law and must be capable of identifying and supervising a chief information officer responsible for managing modern information technology systems. The bill limits the term of office for the Register of Copyrights to 10 years, but the individual may be reappointed subject to the same requirements established in this bill. The President may remove the Register of Copyrights from office and must notify both chambers of Congress of any such removal. (Sec. 3) Nothing in this bill may be construed to impact the mandatory deposit requirements under which owners of a copyright or of an exclusive right of publication must deposit in the U.S. Copyright Office two copies or phonorecords of works published in the United States for the use or disposition of the Library of Congress.
Title
Register of Copyrights Selection and Accountability Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] |
Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] |
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - On agreeing to the Deutch amendment (A001) H.Amdt.109 RC# 226 (Y: 410 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - On passage RC# 227 (Y: 378 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - On passage RC# 227 (Y: 378 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2017-04-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-04-26 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 378 - 48 (Roll no. 227). |
2017-04-26 | House | The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. |
2017-04-26 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1695. |
2017-04-26 | House | H.Amdt.109 On agreeing to the Deutch amendment (A001) Agreed to by recorded vote: 410 - 14 (Roll no. 226). |
2017-04-26 | House | UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on adoption of amendments which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed. |
2017-04-26 | House | H.Amdt.110 On agreeing to the Chu, Judy amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2017-04-26 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 275, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Chu amendment No. 2. |
2017-04-26 | House | H.Amdt.110 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Chu, Judy. (consideration: CR H2875-2876; text: CR H2875) |
2017-04-26 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Deutch amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Goodlatte demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day. |
2017-04-26 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 275, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Deutch amendment No. 1. |
2017-04-26 | House | H.Amdt.109 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Deutch. (consideration: CR H2874-2875, S2876; text CR H2874) |
2017-04-26 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1695. |
2017-04-26 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 275 and Rule XVIII. |
2017-04-26 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Michael K. Simpson to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1695 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. The resolution makes in order an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-13. |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 275. (consideration: CR H2868-2877; text of measure as reported in House: CR H2874) |
2017-04-26 | House | Rule H. Res. 275 passed House. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 275 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1695 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. The resolution makes in order an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-13. |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 51. |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-91. |
2017-03-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 1. |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR275 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1010 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held.
SB1010 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Commerce
Congressional agencies
Congressional oversight
Federal officials
Intellectual property
Library of Congress
Commerce
Congressional agencies
Congressional oversight
Federal officials
Intellectual property
Library of Congress