US HB1683 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Flexibility Act - Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) and the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (ARRA) to repeal certain state Medicaid and State Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) maintenance of effort requirements under titles XIX and XXI of the Social Security Act. (Under "maintenance of efforts" a state is prohibited from having eligibility standards, methodologies, or procedures under its state Medicaid or CHIP plan that are more restrictive than those in effect on on July 1, 2008, under ARRA or on March 23, 2010, under PPACA.)
Title
State Flexibility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Judy Biggert [R-IL] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Thaddeus McCotter [R-MI] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] |
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] |
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Mike J. Rogers [R-MI] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Lee Terry [R-NE] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB868 (Same As) 2011-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5652 (Related) 2012-05-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB6688 (Related) 2012-12-19 - Referred to House Rules
HB5652 (Related) 2012-05-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB6688 (Related) 2012-12-19 - Referred to House Rules
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1683/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1683/BILLS-112hr1683ih.pdf |