US HB167 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wildfire Disaster Funding Act This bill amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 to require specified adjustments to discretionary spending limits in FY2015-FY2022 to accommodate appropriations for wildfire suppression operations in the Wildland Fire Management accounts at the Department of Agriculture (USDA) or the Department of the Interior. If USDA or Interior determines that supplemental appropriations are necessary for wildfire suppression operations, the bill requires the relevant department to submit to Congress a request for the funding and a plan for obligating the funds. The bill also requires the President's budget to include the average costs for wildfire suppression over the previous 10 years.
Title
Wildfire Disaster Funding Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB235 (Related) 2015-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S422)
SB1645 (Related) 2015-06-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
SB3068 (Related) 2016-06-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
SB1645 (Related) 2015-06-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
SB3068 (Related) 2016-06-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget deficits and national debt
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Budget deficits and national debt
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/167/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr167/BILLS-114hr167ih.pdf |