US HB1669 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-16 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-16 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Judgment Fund Transparency Act of 2015 This bill requires the Department of the Treasury to disclose details after payments are made from the Judgment Fund. The Judgment Fund is a permanent and indefinite appropriation to pay judgments against the United States, including awards, compromise settlements, and related interest and costs. Unless the disclosure is prohibited by law or a court order, Treasury must make available to the public on a website: the name of the agency or entity whose actions gave rise to the claim or judgment, the plaintiff or claimant, the counsel for the plaintiff or claimant, the amount paid, a description of the facts that gave rise to the claim, and the name of the agency that submitted the claim.
Title
Judgment Fund Transparency Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] |
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-11-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB350 (Same As) 2015-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB405 (Related) 2015-02-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 15.
SB556 (Related) 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
SB405 (Related) 2015-02-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 15.
SB556 (Related) 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1669/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1669/BILLS-114hr1669ih.pdf |