US HB1665 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster Declaration Improvement Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), in making recommendations to the President regarding a major disaster declaration, to give greater weight and consideration to severe local impact or recent multiple disasters.
Title
Disaster Declaration Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 248 (Y: 425 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-05-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 248). (text: CR 5/02/2017 H3019) |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3089) |
2017-05-02 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Barletta objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2017-05-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1665. |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3019-3022) |
2017-05-02 | House | Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 56. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-99. |
2017-03-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)