US HB1630 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utility Energy Service Contracts Improvement Act of 2015 This bill amends the National Energy Conservation Policy Act to make explicit that utility energy service contracts (UESCs) may have a contract period of up to 25 years. UESCs are contracts that allow utilities to provide federal agencies with energy and water efficiency improvements and demand reduction services. UESC conditions must include requirements for measurement, verification, and performance assurances or guarantees of the savings.
Title
Utility Energy Service Contracts Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB723 (Same As) 2015-04-30 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
Subjects
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Service industries
Water use and supply
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Service industries
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1630/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1630/BILLS-114hr1630ih.pdf |