US HB1623 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain personal use services to be considered as campaign committee expenditures, including child care, elder care, and health insurance, if the services are necessary to enable a candidate to participate in campaign-connected activities. The candidate may not be a current federal officeholder. The amount a committee may pay a candidate as salary is reduced by the amount paid for child care and elder care.
Title
Help America Run Act
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2019-10-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8576-8577) |
2019-10-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1623. |
2019-10-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8576-8579) |
2019-10-29 | House | Ms. Lofgren moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-03-07 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2507-2508) |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB2726 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB2726 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Adult day care
Child care and development
Congressional elections
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Health care coverage and access
Child care and development
Congressional elections
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Health care coverage and access