US HB1622 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Spectrum Innovation Act - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to provide that, if the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) determines that it is consistent with the public interest in spectrum utilization for a licensee to voluntarily relinquish licensed spectrum usage rights to permit the assignment of new initial licenses subject to new service rules, the proceeds from granting such rights to another licensee under an appropriate competitive bidding system must be shared (subject to the FCC retaining certain offsets and deposits for specified program qualification and implementation costs), in an amount or percentage that the FCC considers appropriate, with the licensee who voluntarily relinquished such rights. Directs the FCC to establish rules for such voluntary incentive auction revenue sharing. Prohibits the FCC from reclaiming frequencies of broadcast television licensees directly or indirectly on an involuntary basis for certain licensing purposes.
Title
Spectrum Innovation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB911 (Related) 2011-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SB28 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S146-149)
SB415 (Related) 2011-02-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB455 (Related) 2011-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB28 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S146-149)
SB415 (Related) 2011-02-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB455 (Related) 2011-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Licensing and registrations
Science, technology, communications
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Licensing and registrations
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1622/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1622/BILLS-112hr1622ih.pdf |