US HB1614 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To facilitate the creation of designated shooting ranges on National Forest System land and public land administered by the Bureau of Land Management for the public to use for recreational target shooting, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Range Access Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
2023-03-28HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2023-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2023-03-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-03-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB873 (Related) 2023-07-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 172.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback