US HB1613 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-14)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to improve transparency and prevent the use of abusive spread pricing and related practices in the Medicaid program.
Title
Drug Price Transparency in Medicaid Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] |
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA] | Rep. Cory Mills [R-FL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] |
Rep. Nicholas Langworthy [R-NY] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Mark Alford [R-MO] |
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Marie Gluesenkamp Perez [D-WA] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] |
Rep. Pat Ryan [D-NY] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. George Santos [R-NY] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] |
Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Chuck Edwards [R-NC] |
Rep. Nikki Budzinski [D-IL] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1038 (Same As) 2023-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3561 (Related) 2023-05-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 0.
HB3561 (Related) 2023-05-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 0.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1613/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1613/BILLS-118hr1613ih.pdf |