US HB1585 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Highway Flexibility Act - Allows a state to elect not to participate in the federal-aid highway program, including any federal highway program under the Safe, Accountable, Flexible, Efficient Transportation Equity Act: A Legacy for Users (SAFETEA-LU). Directs the Secretary of Transportation (DOT), beginning in FY2011, to carry out a direct federal-aid highway program to permit a state governor or chief executive officer, at least 90 days before the beginning of a fiscal year, to elect to: (1) waive the state's right to receive apportioned or allocated funds under the federal-aid highway program, and (2) receive instead a prorated amount of taxes appropriated to the Highway Trust Fund (other than for the Mass Transit Account) which are attributable to highway users in the state. Requires a pro rata reduction of such tax-equivalent amount in order to fund contract authority for programs of the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration (NHTSA) and the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration (FMCSA). Requires the state governor or chief executive officer making an election to: (1) agree to maintain the Interstate System in accordance with its current Interstate System program; (2) submit a plan describing the purposes, projects, and uses to which such amounts will be put and the federal-aid highway programmatic requirements the state elects to continue; and (3) agree to obligate program amounts exclusively for projects that would be eligible for surface transportation program funding. Directs the Secretary to carry out a similar alternative funding program for public transportation programs.
Title
State Highway Flexibility Act
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] |
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] |
Rep. Frank Guinta [R-NH] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Alan Nunnelee [R-MS] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] | Rep. John Sullivan [R-OK] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HB632 (Related) 2011-02-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB252 (Related) 2011-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1446 (Related) 2011-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB252 (Related) 2011-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1446 (Related) 2011-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Government trust funds
Intergovernmental relations
Public transit
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Intergovernmental relations
Public transit
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1585/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1585/BILLS-112hr1585ih.pdf |