US HB1579 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secure and Resilient Water Systems Act This bill amends the Safe Drinking Water Act by requiring each community water system to submit to the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) source water and distribution system vulnerability assessments that identify threats from: industrial activity, pipelines and storage tanks, contaminated sites, agricultural activity, and oil and gas exploration; climate change, extreme weather, drought, and temperature changes; and intentional acts, including intentional contamination, sabotage, and theft of any chemical of interest. Each community water system must also submit to the EPA protection plans that mitigate the threats to source water and distribution systems. The EPA must establish a grant program for increasing the resiliency or adaptability of the community water systems to threats.
Title
Secure and Resilient Water Systems Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1068 (Related) 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB2479 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB2479 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
Air quality
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Floods and storm protection
Hydrology and hydrography
Infrastructure development
Oil and gas
Public utilities and utility rates
Water quality
Water storage
Water use and supply
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Floods and storm protection
Hydrology and hydrography
Infrastructure development
Oil and gas
Public utilities and utility rates
Water quality
Water storage
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1579/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1579/BILLS-115hr1579ih.pdf |