US HB157 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia House Voting Rights Act of 2009 - Considers the District of Columbia a congressional district for purposes of representation in the House of Representatives in the 112th Congress and each succeeding Congress. Applies to the District in the same manner as it applies to a state the federal law providing for the 15th and subsequent decennial censuses and for apportionment of Representatives in Congress. Limits the District to one Member under any reapportionment of Members. Modifies the formula regarding the number of presidential electors to subject it to the 23rd amendment to the Constitution in the case of the District. Increases membership of the House from 435 to 437 Members. Provides for a reapportionment of Members resulting from such increase. Directs the Clerk of the House to: (1) certify to the Governor of each state the number of Representatives to which the state is entitled; and (2) identify to the Speaker of the House the state (other than the District of Columbia) entitled to one additional Representative. Requires election at large of such additional Representative. Sets forth procedures for expedited judicial review of any action brought to challenge the constitutionality of any provision of this Act or any amendment made by it.
Title
District of Columbia House Voting Rights Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-02 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 8. | |
2009-03-02 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-22. | |
2009-02-25 | Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Discharged. | |
2009-02-25 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 12. | |
2009-02-25 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-01-29 | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. | |
2009-01-27 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-01-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. | |
2009-01-07 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E26-27) | |
2009-01-06 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR11 (Related) 2009-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2488)
SB160 (Related) 2009-03-02 - Held at the desk.
SB160 (Related) 2009-03-02 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Census and government statistics
Congress
Congressional operations and organization
District of Columbia
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Congress
Congressional operations and organization
District of Columbia
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
House of Representatives
Members of Congress