US HB1569 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-3)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To assist in the conservation of critically endangered species in foreign countries, and for other purposes.
Title
Critically Endangered Animals Conservation Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2026 (Related) 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 408.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1569/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1569/BILLS-117hr1569ih.pdf |