US HB1569 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Innovation Act This bill amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 to require certain adjustments to discretionary spending limits in FY2017-FY2021 to accommodate increases in appropriations for agencies that perform basic science research. Adjustments are required for the National Science Foundation, the Department of Energy Office of Science, Department of Defense science and technology programs, National Institute of Standards and Technology Scientific and Technical Research and Services, and the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) Science Mission Directorate. The bill also requires annual appropriations for each of the programs and agencies referenced in this bill to be at least the amount appropriated in FY2016. The bill exempts appropriations provided pursuant to this bill from sequestration. Sequestration is a process of automatic, usually across-the-board spending reductions under which budgetary resources are permanently cancelled to enforce specific budget policy goals.
Title
American Innovation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB641 (Same As) 2017-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1844-1845)
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget deficits and national debt
Defense spending
Department of Commerce
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Energy research
Executive agency funding and structure
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
National Science Foundation
Research administration and funding
Science, technology, communications
Budget deficits and national debt
Defense spending
Department of Commerce
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Energy research
Executive agency funding and structure
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
National Science Foundation
Research administration and funding
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1569/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1569/BILLS-115hr1569ih.pdf |