US HB1565 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Saving Lives, Saving Costs Act This bill establishes a framework for health care liability lawsuits to undergo review by independent medical review panels if health care professionals (practicing physicians or their agents or employees), providers, or organizations allege adherence to clinical practice guidelines. The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must publish clinical practice guidelines provided and maintained by national or state medical societies or medical specialty societies designated by HHS. HHS must ensure that guidelines are developed in accordance with certain standards, including standards related to transparency, the composition of the panel, and the review of existing evidence. Professional organizations and participants in guideline development may not be held liable for injury allegedly caused by adherence to a guideline to which they contributed. The bill does not preempt: (1) any state or federal law that imposes greater procedural or substantive protections for health care providers and health care organizations from liability, loss, or damages than those provided under this bill; (2) any state or federal law that creates a cause of action; or (3) any defenses otherwise available. The bill gives district courts jurisdiction over health care liability actions against health care professionals, providers, or organizations practicing within clinical practice guidelines. Defendants may remove health care liability actions brought in a state court to a district court.
Title
Saving Lives, Saving Costs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] |
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Kevin Yoder [R-KS] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Scott Taylor [R-VA] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB277 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Federal district courts
Government information and archives
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Jurisdiction and venue
State and local courts
Federal district courts
Government information and archives
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Jurisdiction and venue
State and local courts
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1565/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1565/BILLS-115hr1565ih.pdf |