US HB1561 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior, through the National Park Service (NPS), to make improvements to a support facility, including a visitor center, for a National Historic Site administered by the NPS if such project: (1) is conducted within the agency's existing budget, (2) is subject to a 50% non-federal cost sharing requirement, and (3) is conducted for a unit of the NPS which has the authority to establish a support facility outside the park's boundary. Allows the NPS to operate and use all or part of a support facility, including a visitor center, for such a Site: (1) to carry out the duties associated with the administration and support of such Site, and (2) only in situations where there is an agreement between the Secretary and the commissioners of the county or parish in which the facility is located.
Title
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to make improvements to support facilities for National Historic Sites operated by the National Park Service, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 522. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-691. |
2014-11-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-11-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-11-19 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1071 (Related) 2013-07-31 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93.
Subjects
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Historic sites and heritage areas
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
Historic sites and heritage areas
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism