US HB1535 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a chief state election administration official from taking an active part in political management or in a political campaign with respect to any election for federal office over which such official has supervisory authority, with certain exceptions.
Title
Election Official Integrity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1275 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB4668 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB4668 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Congressional elections
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Family relationships
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Family relationships
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1535/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1535/BILLS-116hr1535ih.pdf |