US HB1527 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve access for outdoor recreation through the use of special recreation permits on Federal recreational lands and waters, and for other purposes.
Title
SOAR Act Simplifying Outdoor Access for Recreation Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1527/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1527/BILLS-118hr1527ih.pdf |