US HB1522 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007 and restores laws amended by such Act.
Title
To repeal the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007.
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2011-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2011-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment. |
2011-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity. |
2011-04-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform . |
2011-04-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2011-04-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House Small Business |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Oversight and Government Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, House Administration, Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Education and the Workforce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Business investment and capital
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of Transportation
Educational facilities and institutions
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental health
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax deductions
Industrial facilities
International organizations and cooperation
Lighting and heating
Marine and inland water transportation
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Product safety and quality
Public contracts and procurement
Public housing
Railroads
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Retail and wholesale trades
Roads and highways
Small business
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation programs funding
U.S. Capitol
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Business investment and capital
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of Transportation
Educational facilities and institutions
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental health
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax deductions
Industrial facilities
International organizations and cooperation
Lighting and heating
Marine and inland water transportation
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Product safety and quality
Public contracts and procurement
Public housing
Railroads
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Retail and wholesale trades
Roads and highways
Small business
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation programs funding
U.S. Capitol
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1522/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1522/BILLS-112hr1522ih.pdf |