US HB1521 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled Veterans Red Tape Reduction Act - Amends the Veterans Benefits Act of 2003 to extend through 2018 Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) authority for the performance of medical disability evaluations by contract physicians.
Title
Disabled Veterans Red Tape Reduction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Ron Barber [D-AZ] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC] |
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] | Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] |
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] |
Rep. Henry Waxman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2013-04-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2148) |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2079 (Related) 2013-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Health personnel
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Health personnel
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1521/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1521/BILLS-113hr1521ih.pdf |