US HB1521 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-15 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-15 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cell Tax Fairness Act of 2009 - Prohibits states or local governments from imposing any new discriminatory tax on mobile services, mobile service providers, or mobile service property for five years after the enactment of this Act. Defines "new discriminatory tax" as a tax imposed on mobile services, providers, or property that is not generally imposed on other types of services or property, or that is generally imposed at a lower rate.
Title
Cell Tax Fairness Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-15 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . | |
2009-06-09 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law. | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1192 (Related) 2009-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1521/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1521/BILLS-111hr1521ih.pdf |