US HB152 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 62.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 62.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corolla Wild Horses Protection Act Directs the Department of the Interior to enter into an agreement with the Corolla Wild Horse Fund, Currituck County, North Carolina, and the state of North Carolina to provide for the management of free-roaming wild horses in and around the Currituck National Wildlife Refuge. Requires that such agreement: (1) allow a herd of between 110 and 130 free-roaming wild horses in and around the Refuge; (2) provide for cost-effective management of such horses while ensuring that natural resources within the Refuge are not adversely impacted; (3) provide for the introduction of a small number of free-roaming wild horses from the herd at Cape Lookout National Seashore as is necessary to maintain the genetic viability of the herd in and around the Refuge; and (4) require such Fund to pay the costs of inspecting the health of the horses, maintaining records, coordinating the removal and placement of such horses, and administering a viable population control plan for the horses. Prohibits the removal of any horse from the Seashore for introduction at the Refuge except with the approval of the Foundation for Shackleford Horses Inc. and consistent with the memorandum of understanding between the National Park Service and the Foundation and the management plan for the Shackleford Banks Horse Herd. Declares that nothing in this Act shall be construed as creating liability of the United States for any damages caused by the free-roaming wild horses to any person or property located inside or outside the boundaries of the Refuge.
Title
Corolla Wild Horses Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 62. |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-84. |
2015-03-25 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2015-03-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1204 (Related) 2015-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Endangered and threatened species
Mammals
North Carolina
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Endangered and threatened species
Mammals
North Carolina
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection