US HB1503 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-290.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-290.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act regarding the list under section 505(j)(7) of the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Orange Book Transparency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 187 (Y: 422 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-290. |
2021-01-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7130-7131) |
2020-12-10 | House | Mrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent to take the bill, H.R. 1503 from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7130-7131) |
2020-12-10 | House | Mrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7242-7243) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | S.Amdt.2693 Amendment SA 2693 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | S.Amdt.2693 Amendment SA 2693 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S7244; text: CR S7242-7243) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7244) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2019-05-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 187). (text: CR H3486-3487) |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3491) |
2019-05-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-05-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1503. |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3486-3488) |
2019-05-08 | House | Ms. Eshoo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 25. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-47. |
2019-04-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-03-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB1503 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-290.
HB1503 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-290.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government information and archives
Health
Intellectual property
Prescription drugs
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government information and archives
Health
Intellectual property
Prescription drugs