US HB1496 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-13)
Status: Passed on July 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-207.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4040 West Washington Boulevard in Los Angeles, California, as the "Marvin Gaye Post Office". (Sec. 1) Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4040 West Washington Boulevard in Los Angeles, California, as the "Marvin Gaye Post Office."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4040 West Washington Boulevard in Los Angeles, California, as the "Marvin Gaye Post Office".

Sponsors

Rep. Karen Bass [D]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D]Rep. Barbara Lee [D]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D]Rep. John Conyers [D]Rep. Steve Cohen [D]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D]Rep. Dwight Evans [D]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D]
Rep. Jim Costa [D]Rep. Julia Brownley [D]Rep. Mark Takano [D]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D]
Rep. Jared Huffman [D]Rep. John Garamendi [D]Rep. Jackie Speier [D]Rep. Judy Chu [D]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D]
Rep. Danny Davis [D]Rep. Andre Carson [D]Rep. Keith Ellison [D]Rep. Robin Kelly [D]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D]Rep. Donald Payne [D]Rep. G. Butterfield [D]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D]Rep. James Langevin [D]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D]Rep. Brad Sherman [D]Rep. Ted Lieu [D]Rep. Susan Davis [D]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D]Rep. Mike Thompson [D]Rep. Doris Matsui [D]
Rep. Ami Bera [D]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D]Rep. Ro Khanna [D]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D]Rep. Norma Torres [D]Rep. Maxine Waters [D]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D]Rep. Luis Correa [D]Rep. Scott Peters [D]Rep. Ken Calvert [R]
Rep. Paul Cook [R]Rep. Darrell Issa [R]Rep. Edward Royce [R]Rep. Jeff Denham [R]
Rep. Mimi Walters [R]Rep. Tom McClintock [R]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R]Rep. Nancy Pelosi [D]
Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R]Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R]Rep. Duncan Hunter [R]Rep. David Valadao [R]
Rep. Stephen Knight [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-24SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-207.
2018-07-24SenateSigned by President.
2018-07-12SenatePresented to President.
2018-06-29SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-06-28SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4808)
2018-06-14SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 455.
2018-06-14SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
2018-06-13SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-05-08SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-05-07HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2018-05-07HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-05-07HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3756)
2018-05-07HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1496.
2018-05-07HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3756)
2018-05-07HouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-03-15HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2018-03-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-03-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
2017-03-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback