US HB1496 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Reserve Transparency Act - Directs the Comptroller General to complete, within 12 months after enactment of this Act, an audit of the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and of the federal reserve banks, followed by a detailed report to Congress.
Title
Federal Reserve Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management. |
2011-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
HB459 (Related) 2013-01-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 580.
SB202 (Related) 2011-01-26 - Referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S282-283)
SB202 (Related) 2011-01-26 - Referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S282-283)
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Government studies and investigations
Monetary policy
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Government studies and investigations
Monetary policy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1496/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1496/BILLS-112hr1496ih.pdf |