US HB147 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 10, United States Code, to make certain improvements to services and benefits for veterans and separating members of the Armed Forces with respect to apprenticeship programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Bringing Registered Apprenticeships to Veterans Education Act BRAVE Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 427 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-11-16 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 427 - 0 (Roll no. 376). (text: CR H6289) |
2021-11-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6298-6299) |
2021-11-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 147. |
2021-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6289-6291) |
2021-11-16 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged. |
2021-04-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |