US HB1402 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 113-59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 113-59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
VA Expiring Authorities Extension Act of 2013 - (Sec. 4) Extends through FY2015 the authorization of appropriations to the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for: (1) payment by the VA Secretary of a monthly assistance allowance to disabled veterans (veterans) and members of the Armed Forces (members) training or competing for the U.S. Paralympic Team, and (2) a program for establishing and carrying out related programs and events. (Sec. 5) Allows any entity with significant experience in managing large-scale adaptive sports programs (under current law, only the United States Olympic Committee) to receive VA grants for planning, developing, managing, and implementing programs to provide adaptive sports opportunities for veterans and members. Extends funding assistance to include any such opportunities occurring during FY2010-FY2016. Requires a report from the Comptroller General on the use of such funds during the first program year after the date of enactment of this Act. (Sec. 6) Extends through 2014: (1) VA authority to transport individuals to and from VA facilities in connection with vocational rehabilitation, counseling, examination, treatment, or care; (2) VA authority to operate a regional office in the Republic of the Philippines; (3) the VA requirement to provide nursing home care to any veteran with a service-connected disability rated at 70% or more and in need of such care; (4) VA authority to provide treatment, rehabilitation, and related services for seriously mentally ill and homeless veterans; (5) VA authority to provide expanded services and housing assistance to homeless veterans; (6) the Advisory Committee on Homeless Veterans; (7) the Veterans' Advisory Commission on Education; and (8) the temporary authority for the performance of VA medical disability examinations by contract physicians. (Sec. 13) Extends through FY2014 VA requirements resulting from default on VA-guaranteed loans.
Title
VA Expiring Authorities Extension Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-10 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 353 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-59. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8964) |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2013-12-10 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2013-12-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 353 - 0 (Roll no. 631). (text: CR H7615-7616) |
2013-12-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7618-7619) |
2013-12-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1402. |
2013-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7614-7617) |
2013-12-10 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. (consideration: CR H7615) |
2013-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2013-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB695 (Same As) 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Athletes
Disability assistance
Olympic games
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Athletes
Disability assistance
Olympic games
Veterans' pensions and compensation