US HB1397 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize, direct, facilitate, and expedite the transfer of administrative jurisdiction of certain Federal land, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill transfers administrative jurisdiction over: 0.342 acres of federal land within the boundary of the George Washington Memorial Parkway from the Department of the Interior to the Department of Transportation (DOT), and 0.479 acres of federal land within the boundary of the Turner-Fairbank Highway Research Center of the Federal Highway Administration (FHA) adjacent to the parkway from DOT to Interior. Interior shall prohibit the storage, construction, or installation of any items that may interfere with access by the research center to certain restricted land within the parkway boundary for security and maintenance purposes. The transfers of administrative jurisdiction under this bill shall not be subject to reimbursement or consideration. The National Park Service and the FHA shall comply with the agreement they entered into on September 11, 2002, regarding the transfer of administrative jurisdiction, management, and maintenance of the land specified in it. Subject to the terms of such agreement, Interior shall allow the research center to access specified acreage of: (1) the federal land transferred to Interior for purposes of transportation to and from the research center, and (2) such such land and the restricted land for maintenance of the visual appearance of such land. The Research Center shall maintain the restricted land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To authorize, direct, facilitate, and expedite the transfer of administrative jurisdiction of certain Federal land, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 406 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11SenatePresented to President.
2018-06-07SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-06-06SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3264)
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 434.
2018-05-24SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-257.
2018-03-08SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-02-14SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2017-07-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-07-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 0 (Roll no. 345). (text: CR H5404)
2017-07-11HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5417)
2017-07-11HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-07-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1397.
2017-07-11HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5404)
2017-07-11HouseMr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-07-11HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 143.
2017-07-11HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
2017-07-11HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-206, Part I.
2017-06-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-06-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-03-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-03-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2017-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback