US HB1392 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program through December 31, 2024.
Title
National Flood Insurance Program Extension Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2391 (Related) 2023-07-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2968 (Related) 2024-01-25 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB5828 (Related) 2023-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB2968 (Related) 2024-01-25 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB5828 (Related) 2023-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1392/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1392/BILLS-118hr1392ih.pdf |