US HB1383 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Adult Day Services Act of 2015 Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to: (1) cover certified adult day services furnished in a certified adult day services center and meeting specified requirements, and (2) require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to increase by 3% the payment amount otherwise effective for such services furnished in a rural area on or after January 1, 2016, and before January 1, 2018.
Title
Medicare Adult Day Services Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1383/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1383/BILLS-114hr1383ih.pdf |