US HB1368 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Animal Welfare Accountability and Transparency Act This bill requires the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to maintain and publicly disclose records relating to the administration of the Animal Welfare Act and the Horse Protection Act, including specified details regarding inspections, enforcement actions, regulations, registrations, and licenses under the two laws. Within 90 days of the enactment of this bill, USDA must make the records available to the public in an online searchable database in a machine-readable format on its website. The bill also amends the Internal Revenue Code to require a taxpayer who has been convicted or assessed civil penalties for violating certain provisions of the Animal Welfare Act or the Horse Protection Act to use the alternative depreciation system that increases the number of years over which property is depreciated. The taxpayer must use the system for any property placed in service during the five-year period beginning with the year in which the period for seeking judicial review of a civil penalty has lapsed or in which there has been a final judgment entered with respect to the violation, whichever is earlier.
Title
Animal Welfare Accountability and Transparency Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-06 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E275) |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB503 (Same As) 2017-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1580; text of measure as introduced: CR S1580-1581)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Business investment and capital
Civil actions and liability
Department of Agriculture
Government information and archives
Income tax deductions
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Business investment and capital
Civil actions and liability
Department of Agriculture
Government information and archives
Income tax deductions
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1368/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1368/BILLS-115hr1368ih.pdf |