US HB1365 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Homeland Security Acquisition Innovation Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to authorize the Department of Homeland Security's (DHS's) Under Secretary for Management to: designate an individual within DHS to manage DHS acquisition innovation efforts, test emerging acquisition best practicess, develop and distribute best practices and lessons learned regarding acquisition innovations, establish metrics to measure the effectiveness of acquisition innovation efforts, and determine impacts of acquisition innovation efforts on the private sector by obtaining feedback from it and incorporating such feedback into future acquisition innovation efforts. The bill requires DHS, by 90 days after it submits the annual budget justification for DHS for each of FY2018-FY2022, to provide information to specified congressional committees on: emerging acquisition best practices that were tested within DHS, efforts to distribute best practices and lessons learned within DHS, utilization of best practices by DHS components, performance as measured by the metrics established under this bill, outcomes of efforts to distribute best practices and lessons learned within DHS, impacts of the utilization of innovative acquisition mechanisms by DHS on the private sector, the criteria used to identify specific acquisition programs or activities to be included in acquisition innovation efforts and the outcomes of such programs or activities, and recommendations to enhance acquisition innovation in DHS.
Title
Department of Homeland Security Acquisition Innovation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 193 (Y: 424 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-03-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-03-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 193). (text: CR H2307) |
2017-03-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2392) |
2017-03-22 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Donovan objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2017-03-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1365. |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2307-2308) |
2017-03-22 | House | Mr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-03-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 28. |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-48. |
2017-03-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Federal officials
Government operations and politics
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Small business
Department of Homeland Security
Federal officials
Government operations and politics
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Small business