US HB1354 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanently Protecting Tenants at Foreclosure Act of 2015 This bill amends the Protecting Tenants at Foreclosure Act of 2009 to repeal its sunset date December 31, 2014 (thus making the Act permanent). This bill restores and revives such Act, the provisions of law amended or repealed by it, and any regulations promulgated pursuant to it, as were in effect on December 31, 2014, as if the sunset had not taken effect.
Title
Permanently Protecting Tenants at Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] |
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB730 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2642 (Related) 2015-06-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1491 (Related) 2015-10-28 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Protection. Hearings held.
HB2642 (Related) 2015-06-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1491 (Related) 2015-10-28 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Protection. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1354/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1354/BILLS-114hr1354ih.pdf |