US HB1349 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 805.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Wilderness Act to ensure that the use of bicycles, wheelchairs, strollers, and game carts is not prohibited in Wilderness Areas, and for other purposes. This bill amends the Wilderness Act to declare that provisions of such Act prohibiting the use of motorized vehicles, aircraft, or other forms of mechanical transport shall not prohibit the use of motorized wheelchairs, non-motorized wheelchairs, non-motorized bicycles, strollers, wheelbarrows, survey wheels, or game carts within any wilderness areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Wilderness Act to ensure that the use of bicycles, wheelchairs, strollers, and game carts is not prohibited in Wilderness Areas, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 805.
2018-11-16HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1032.
2017-12-13HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 18.
2017-12-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-12HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2017-12-07HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-03-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-03-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback