US HB1346 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 105-7)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Device Safety Act of 2009 - Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to prohibit specified provisions preempting state and local requirements for medical devices intended for human use from being construed to modify or otherwise affect any action for damages or the liability of any person under state law. Makes this Act effective as if it were included in the Medical Device Amendments of 1976 and applicable to any civil action pending or filed on or after the date of enactment of this Act.
Title
Medical Device Safety Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-03-06 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB540 (Same As) 2009-08-04 - Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 111-1031.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Federal preemption
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Product safety and quality
Federal preemption
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Product safety and quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1346/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1346/BILLS-111hr1346ih.pdf |