US HB1343 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To codify the Institute for Telecommunication Sciences and to direct the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to establish an initiative to support the development of emergency communication and tracking technologies, and for other purposes.
Title
Institute for Telecommunication Sciences Codification Act ITS Codification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2023-04-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-04-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1924) |
2023-04-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1343. |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1924-1925) |
2023-04-25 | House | Mr. Latta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-04-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 26. |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-40. |
2023-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 0. |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-08 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 0 . |
2023-03-08 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3781 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.