US HB1339 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Transportation to establish an advanced air mobility interagency working group, and for other purposes.
Title
Advanced Air Mobility Coordination and Leadership Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX] | Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-04 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 383 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2021-11-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-04 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 383 - 41 (Roll no. 360). (text: 11/3/2021 CR H6138-6139) |
2021-11-04 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6197-6198) |
2021-11-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-11-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1339. |
2021-11-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6138-6141) |
2021-11-03 | House | Mr. Pappas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-11-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 115. |
2021-11-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-158. |
2021-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB516 (Related) 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-203.