US HB1339 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 100-17)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-241.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 100-17)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-241.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Salem, Massachusetts, as the Birthplace of the National Guard of the United States. Directs the Chief of the National Guard Bureau to provide military ceremonial support at the dedication of any monument, plaque, or other official recognition celebrating such designation. Prohibits federal funds from being used in connection with such recognition.
Title
To designate the City of Salem, Massachusetts, as the Birthplace of the National Guard of the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 413 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 413 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 413 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-10 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-241. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8377) |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
2012-03-28 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2012-03-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-03-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 6, 4 Present (Roll no. 141). (text: CR H1652) |
2012-03-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1664) |
2012-03-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2012-03-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1339. |
2012-03-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1652-1654) |
2012-03-28 | House | Mr. Platts moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2013 (Same As) 2011-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.